DC PR23-0071 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Resolution R23-0030, Effective from Mar 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2906
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Resolution R23-0030, Effective from Mar 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2906
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Chief Technology Officer Lindsey Parker Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Chief Technology Officer Lindsey Parker Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Council | Resolution R23-0030, Effective from Mar 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2906 |
2019-03-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0030 |
2019-03-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-02-22 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-02-22 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0071 |
2019-02-08 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-02-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0071 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |