DC PR23-0129 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Department Of Consumer And Regulatory Affairs Ernest Chrappah Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department Of Consumer And Regulatory Affairs Ernest Chrappah Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-06-04CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR23-0129
2019-06-04CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-04-23CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-03-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-03-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0129 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-02-26CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback