DC PR23-0162 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Real Property Tax Commission Stacie Scott Turner Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Real Property Tax Commission Stacie Scott Turner Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-05-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0162 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0162 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41981/Introduction/PR23-0162-Introduction.pdf |