DC PR23-0177 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Resolution R23-0056, Effective from Jun 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Resolution R23-0056, Effective from Jun 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Not-For-Profit Hospital Corporation Board of Directors Konrad Dawson Reappointment Resolution of 2019
Title
Not-For-Profit Hospital Corporation Board of Directors Konrad Dawson Reappointment Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Council | Resolution R23-0056, Effective from Jun 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7619 |
2019-06-28 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0056 |
2019-04-09 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-04-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-04-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0177 |
2019-03-22 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0177 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |