DC PR23-0183 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Resolution R23-0106 Effective from June 4, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7062
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commission On Fashion Arts And Events Emilia Ferrara Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission On Fashion Arts And Events Emilia Ferrara Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14CouncilResolution R23-0106 Effective from June 4, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7062
2019-06-04CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0106
2019-06-04CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-05-01CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-05-01CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR23-0183
2019-04-24CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2019-04-12CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-03-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0183 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2019-03-11CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback