DC PR23-0184 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Resolution R23-0115 Effective from June 4, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7065
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Director Of The Office Of Asian And Pacific Islander Affairs Ben De Guzman Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Director Of The Office Of Asian And Pacific Islander Affairs Ben De Guzman Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14CouncilResolution R23-0115 Effective from June 4, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7065
2019-06-04CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-06-04CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0115
2019-05-22CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-05-22CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR23-0184
2019-05-09CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2019-05-03CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-04-25CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2019-04-05CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-03-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0184 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2019-03-11CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback