DC PR23-0218 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution R23-0064, Effective from Apr 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4401
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution R23-0064, Effective from Apr 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4401
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. CW58776 with VCare, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Contract No. CW58776 with VCare, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Council | Resolution R23-0064, Effective from Apr 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4401 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0064 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-03-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |