DC PR23-0222 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - Resolution R23-0158, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12096
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - Resolution R23-0158, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12096
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Charter School Board Ricarda Ganjam Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Public Charter School Board Ricarda Ganjam Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Council | Resolution R23-0158, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12096 |
2019-08-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-07-09 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0158 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-07-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0222 |
2019-07-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-07-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0222 |
2019-06-27 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0222 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-03-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |