DC PR23-0231 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Resolution R23-0343, Effective from Feb 04, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Resolution R23-0343, Effective from Feb 04, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council Urging Fair and Equitable Funding for Ward 8 Public Schools Resolution of 2019
Title
Sense of the Council Urging Fair and Equitable Funding for Ward 8 Public Schools Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Council | Resolution R23-0343, Effective from Feb 04, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2111 |
2020-02-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0343 |
2020-02-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-02-04 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2019-04-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0231 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-04-02 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |