DC PR23-0285 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-10 - Resolution R23-0198, Effective from Sep 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-10 - Resolution R23-0198, Effective from Sep 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Zoning Commission Peter Shapiro Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Zoning Commission Peter Shapiro Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-10 | Council | Resolution R23-0198, Effective from Sep 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 156 |
2019-12-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-09-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0198 |
2019-09-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-09-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0285 |
2019-06-27 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-06-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0285 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-05-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |