DC PR23-0336 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Resolution R23-0103, Effective from May 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Resolution R23-0103, Effective from May 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legitimate Theater Sidewalk Cafe Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Legitimate Theater Sidewalk Cafe Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Council | Resolution R23-0103, Effective from May 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6795 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-05-28 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0103 |
2019-05-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-05-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |