DC PR23-0340 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Resolution R23-0126, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Resolution R23-0126, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 14 and 15 to Contract No. DCAM-15-NC-0085B with National Service Contractors, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Modification Nos. 14 and 15 to Contract No. DCAM-15-NC-0085B with National Service Contractors, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Council | Resolution R23-0126, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7101 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0126 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-05-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |