DC PR23-0355 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-10 - Resolution R23-0200, Effective from Sep 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-10 - Resolution R23-0200, Effective from Sep 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Historic Preservation Review Board Linda Greene Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Historic Preservation Review Board Linda Greene Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-10 | Council | Resolution R23-0200, Effective from Sep 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 157 |
2019-12-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-09-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0200 |
2019-09-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-09-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0355 |
2019-07-03 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-06-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-06-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0355 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |