DC PR23-0465 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - Resolution R23-0293, Effective from Dec 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16515
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - Resolution R23-0293, Effective from Dec 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16515
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority Board of Directors David Franco Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority Board of Directors David Franco Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-27 | Council | Resolution R23-0293, Effective from Dec 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16515 |
2019-12-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0293 |
2019-12-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-12-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0465 |
2019-12-04 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-10-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0465 Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |