DC PR23-0553 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-22 - Resolution R23-0269, Effective from Nov 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15379
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-22 - Resolution R23-0269, Effective from Nov 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15379
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Advisory Neighborhood Commission Accountability Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Advisory Neighborhood Commission Accountability Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-22 | Council | Resolution R23-0269, Effective from Nov 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15379 |
2019-11-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-11-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0269 |
2019-11-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-11-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |