DC PR23-0872 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Resolution R23-0458, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Resolution R23-0458, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Second Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Second Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | Council | Resolution R23-0458, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9170 |
2020-07-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |