DC PR23-0917 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Resolution R23-0626, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14805
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Housing Production Trust Fund Board Chapman Todd Confirmation Resolution of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Production Trust Fund Board Chapman Todd Confirmation Resolution of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-25CouncilResolution R23-0626, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14805
2020-12-15CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0626
2020-12-15CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-12-04CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-12-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-12-04CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-12-04CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR23-0917
2020-12-04CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-12-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-11-20CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2020-11-20CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2020-11-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-10-30CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-10-23CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-07-31CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0917 Published in the DC Register
2020-07-28CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2020-07-27CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback