DC PR23-0930 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Resolution R23-0554, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13965
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Resolution R23-0554, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13965
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Trustees of the University of the District of Columbia Christopher Bell Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Title
Board of Trustees of the University of the District of Columbia Christopher Bell Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Resolution R23-0554, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13965 |
2020-11-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0554 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0930 |
2020-10-08 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0930 Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |