DC PR23-0935 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Resolution R23-0579, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Resolution R23-0579, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Historic Preservation Review Board Marnique Heath Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Title
Historic Preservation Review Board Marnique Heath Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Council | Resolution R23-0579, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00142 |
2020-12-22 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0579 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0935 |
2020-10-08 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-09-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0935 Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |