DE HB102 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill allows a person who is arrested or convicted of any crime, except a violent felony, which was a direct result of being a victim of human trafficking may file an application or for a pardon or expungement or make a motion to vacate judgment. This bill also makes changes to the Human Trafficking Interagency coordinating by adding another member of the judicial branch and a representative of the Department of Education. This bill also adds locations where a public awareness sign must be placed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-16 | Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate | |
2019-04-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-04-16 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 102 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |