DE HB106 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Delaware is one of only a few states that does not provide statutory or regulatory authority regarding the regulation of service contracts and warranties. In some states, these products are regulated as insurance products. In other states, the Attorney Generals office retains oversight of these products. In Delaware, the regulation of these products is governed by a letter issued by the Department of Insurance in 1993 and Domestic/Foreign Insurers Bulletin No. 5 issued in 1997. This legislation essentially codifies the existing legal practice, and makes clear these products are not regulated as insurance products thus providing the Department of Justice with the authority to address legal issues pertaining to service contracts and product warranties.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Related To Service Contracts And Product Warranties.
Sponsors
Rep. William Bush [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] |
Rep. Andria Bennett [D] | Rep. Sean Matthews [D] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] | Rep. Michael Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-11 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-15 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2019-05-14 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |