DE HB109 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the municipal Charter of the City of Newark as follows:
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Newark.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2019-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-09 | Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2019-05-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-05-09 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 109 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-05-02 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 109 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |