DE HB110 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Defeated By House. Votes: 21 YES 15 NO 5 NOT VOTING
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Defeated By House. Votes: 21 YES 15 NO 5 NOT VOTING
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Delaware Marijuana Control Act regulates and taxes marijuana in the same manner as alcohol. It allows adults over the age of 21 to legally possess and consume under 1 ounce of marijuana for personal use. It does not permit people to grow their own marijuana.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 And Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Creating The Delaware Marijuana Control Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Defeated By House. Votes: 21 YES 15 NO 5 NOT VOTING | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 110 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 110 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 110 - Defeated In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment HA 2 to HA 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Defeated By House. Votes: 18 YES 23 NO | |
2018-06-12 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 110 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 7 On Its Merits, 2 Unfavorable | |
2017-03-30 | ReAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House | |
2017-03-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |