DE HB112 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows the Division of Motor Vehicles to issue special Bicycle Friendly Delaware license plates.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special License Plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-24 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2019-04-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-18 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 112 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-04-18 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 112 - Stricken in House | |
2019-04-18 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 112 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |