DE HB113 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill clarifies that Delaware law enforcement may enter into agreements to provide mutual assistance to other jurisdictions.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Police Mutual Aid Agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-04 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |