DE HB129 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Stricken in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Stricken in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates a mechanism by which school boards may increase funds for a school district both with and without a referendum. This bill also provides how certain school boards may levy real estate taxes.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Local School Taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Sen. Laura Sturgeon [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Lockman [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] |
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Stricken in House | |
2019-06-14 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 129 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-05-09 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 129 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-05-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |