DE HB20 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill raises the threshold limit requiring a Building and Loan Association to obtain federal deposit insurance from $7 million to $10 million dollars. This amount was last raised in 2005. The State Bank Commissioner is okay with this change.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 5 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Building And Loan Association Insurance Regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-04-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-26 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2019-03-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2019-01-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 12 On Its Merits | |
2018-12-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |