DE HB205 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill clarifies the options for becoming licensed as a master barber. In particular, a cosmetologist will be able to become licensed as a master barber after one year of post-licensure work experience and a 35-hour course in shaving. The reciprocity provision requires that an applicant from a state with less stringent licensure requirements than those of Delaware have work experience. The provision has been amended to require one continuous year of licensed experience obtained within the 5 years immediately preceding application. This amendment will address the ongoing challenge where applicants from neighboring states have difficulty becoming licensed in Delaware. The limitation on daily work hours has been stricken. Part-time applicants at times need to work more than 10 hours per day to meet licensure requirements. The 40 hours per week cap remains. The apprenticeship provision has been amended to permit a licensed instructor to supervise up to 5 apprentices. Revisions clarify that only temporary hair removal is within the scope of practice for cosmetologists and aestheticians. Finally, the reinstatement provision has been revised to provide that, if a licensee has not renewed his or her license within 5 years, that licensee can apply for reinstatement by taking the practical examination again.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Cosmetology And Barbering.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Signed by Governor
2019-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2019-06-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-06-26 Amendment SA 1 to HB 205 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-06-19 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2019-06-13 Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
2019-06-13 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-06-13 Amendment HA 1 to HB 205 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2019-06-13 Amendment HA 1 to HB 205 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-06-12 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2019-06-11 Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback