DE HB206 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act authorizes the Division of Motor Vehicles to issue special registration plates to commemorate the Delaware State Education Association centennial. It also allows the Division to collect a 1-time administrative fee of $15 to be deposited into a special fund and used by the Division for administrative costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special Registration Plates For The Delaware State Education Association Centennial.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17 Signed by Governor
2019-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2019-06-26 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2019-06-21 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2019-06-20 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-06-19 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2019-06-11 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback