DE HB230 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows the Delaware Health Information Network ("DHIN") to enter into an appropriate agreement with the State Council for Persons with Disabilities (SCPD) to provide access to all claims data reported to the Delaware Health Care Claims Database. The SCPDs Brain Injury Committee (BIC) has been discussing the BICs need for data with the DHIN for over a year and the DHIN and the SCPD found that utilizing existing data collection systems is more cost-effective and efficient than setting up a separate registry for Delawares Traumatic Brain Injury (TBI) patients.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Health Care Claims Database.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2019-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |