DE HB3 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This legislation requires that all full-time employees of the State, including employees of school districts, continuously in the employ of the state for at least one year, shall be eligible for 12 weeks of paid leave upon the birth or adoption of a child 6 years of age or younger. Both parents would be eligible for such leave. Employees shall continue to have the right, as they do under current law, to use accrued sick leave for maternity and paternity purposes. This legislation leaves intact the rights of persons adopting a child over 6 years of age to take unpaid leave. Due to lack of adequate paid family leave policies, many parents must return to work sooner than is optimal for the health of mothers (in the case of biological birth) and children. Granting paid leave will contribute to the establishment of parent-child bonds, breastfeeding establishment, and allow infants to receive vaccines and develop stronger immune systems prior to entering daycare. Further, a more generous leave policy will increase the productivity of workers and reduce employee turnover.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 14 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Family Leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 4 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-20 | Amendment SA 2 to HB 3 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 7 YES 13 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-20 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 3 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 5 YES 15 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-13 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-12 | Passed By House. Votes: 27 YES 13 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-12 | Amendment HA 4 to HB 3 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-12 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 3 - Stricken in House | |
2018-06-12 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 3 - Defeated By House. Votes: 16 YES 24 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-12 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 3 - Stricken in House | |
2018-06-12 | Amendment HA 4 to HB 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2018-04-25 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-03-14 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2018-01-17 | Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 3 Favorable | |
2018-01-09 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-04-05 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |