DE HB300 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill makes it a crime to sell, transfer, buy, receive or possess a trigger crank or bump-fire device designed to accelerate the rate of fire of a semiautomatic rifle, making such weapon function more like an automatic weapon. A bump stock was used by the gunman in Las Vegas in October 2017. Violation of this provision is a Class E felony.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Destructive Weapons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-14 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-05 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-05 | Amendment SA 5 to HB 300 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 NO | |
2018-06-05 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-06-05 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2018-05-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 NO | |
2018-05-01 | Amendment HA 5 to HB 300 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-05-01 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 5 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-05-01 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 5 to HB 300 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-01 | Amendment HA 5 to HB 300 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-01 | Amendment HA 4 to HB 300 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-05-01 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 300 - Stricken in House | |
2018-04-30 | Amendment HA 4 to HB 300 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-03-27 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 300 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-03-15 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 1 NO 2 ABSENT | |
2018-03-15 | Amendment SA 4 to HB 300 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-03-15 | Amendment SA 3 to HB 300 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 9 YES 11 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-03-15 | Amendment SA 2 to HB 300 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-03-15 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 300 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 10 YES 9 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2018-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-09 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-03-08 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 3 NO 11 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2018-03-08 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 300 - Stricken in House | |
2018-03-08 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 300 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-03-08 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-03-08 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 300 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-01-24 | Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 NO | |
2018-01-23 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 300 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-12-14 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |