DE HB34 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter of the City of Rehoboth Beach to make Sections 3 through 7 gender-neutral, to provide travel reimbursement at the Internal Revenue Service rate rather than the Sussex County Sheriffs rate, to reduce the ownership requirement for non-resident freeholders for voter eligibility from six months to thirty days, to make the Citys process to purge individuals from the Books of Registered Voters consistent with the States process at 15 Del. C ยง1704(g), to allow for voter registration up to thirty days prior to the Annual Municipal Election, to amend the definition of real property to include condominiums created under the Delaware Uniform Common Interest Ownership Act, to reduce the durational residency requirement for voter eligibility from six months to thirty days, to define domicile, and to clarify that all voting provisions in the City Charter (including annual municipal elections, annexation elections and borrowing and bond issuance elections) shall be construed in accordance with the principle of one person, one vote, and removes any form of artificial entity voting from annexation elections and borrowing and bond issuance elections.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Rehoboth Beach Relating To Municipal Elections And Voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-03-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-01-22 | Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2019-01-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-01-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-01-07 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |