DE HB355 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows an agency, as defined in ยง 6902 of Title 29, (agency) to accept electronic bid submissions and on-line bidding for contracts procuring material and nonprofessional services.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To State Procurement.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Daniel Short [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-12 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-25 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-04-24 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-04-24 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 355 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-04-24 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 355 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-04-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-27 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |