DE HB370 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill adds the Secretary of the Department of Human Resources and the Executive Director of Delaware CLASI or their designees to the Employment First Oversight Commission (hereinafter EFOC). The Bill also allows non-Delaware residents who work in Delaware for an employment agency that advocates or represents disabled individuals to participate on the EFOC. Finally, the Bill eliminates the prohibition on appointment of state employees to the EFOC under ยง 745 (1).
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Employment Practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-07-01 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2018-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-26 | Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |