DE HB62 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act revises the Delaware Nursing Home Resident's Quality Assurance Commission by doing all of the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Nursing Home Residents Quality Assurance Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Sen. Anthony Delcollo [R] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] |
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-09 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2019-04-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-04-09 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 62 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-03-13 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 62 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-03-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2019-02-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |