DE HB63 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act revises the crime of "unlawfully permitting a child access to a firearm," an existing class A misdemeanor under Delaware law. The offense is renamed "unsafe storage of a firearm" to place emphasis on firearm safety and proper storage. Under the revised statute, a crime is committed when a person intentionally or recklessly stores or leaves a loaded firearm where a minor or other person prohibited by law, or unauthorized person, can access the firearm, and the unauthorized person obtains the firearm. The unauthorized persons use of the firearm to inflict serious physical injury or death is not an element of the offense, but is an aggravating factor. For the purposes of this offense, stores and leaves does not include when firearm is carried by or under the control of the owner or another lawfully-authorized user.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Safe Storage Of Firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06 Signed by Governor
2019-06-04 Passed By House. Votes: 23 YES 18 NO
2019-04-17 Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 8 NO
2019-04-17 Amendment SA 2 to HB 63 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-04-17 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2019-04-12 Amendment SA 1 to HB 63 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-03-26 Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
2019-03-26 Passed By House. Votes: 22 YES 19 NO
2019-03-13 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2019-02-28 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback