DE HB74 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill enables a key component of the Take Care Delaware program, a partnership between law enforcement and schools to adopt a trauma-informed approach to children who have been identified at the scene of a traumatic event. The Take Care Delaware program, which will start as a pilot, operates by a police officer or emergency-care provider alerting a childs school about the childs presence at a traumatic event that the police officer or emergency-care provider responded to. In order to avoid violations of the State Bureau of Investigations dissemination statute and the Victims Bill of Rights in Title 11, this bill creates a narrow exception to both statutes that allows police officers and emergency-care providers to send the childs name to their school district or charter school so that the childs teachers can ensure the child is handled in a trauma-informed way. The Take Care Delaware program is based on the national Handle With Care model and includes training and other best practices for law enforcement and schools to prevent and mitigate the negative impact of childhood exposure to trauma.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Regarding Dissemination Of Personal Information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-26 Signed by Governor
2019-06-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2019-06-19 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2019-06-13 Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate
2019-06-13 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2019-06-13 Amendment HA 1 to HB 74 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2019-06-05 Amendment HA 1 to HB 74 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-06-05 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2019-05-16 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback