DE HB87 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act enables Kent County to establish regulations regarding property maintenance and penalties for violations of said regulations.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9 Part Iii Of The Delaware Code Related To Property Maintenance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2020-01-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2020-01-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-12-19 | Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-25 | Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 7 ABSENT | |
2019-06-25 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 87 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-25 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 87 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-25 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 87 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-13 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 87 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-04-11 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 87 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-04-11 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 87 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House |