DE SB147 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows the Department of Safety and Homeland Security to share accident reports and the data in the reports with the Department of Transportation. This Act also allows the Department of Transportation to provide certain de-identified data from accident reports to limited requestors.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Accident Statistics And Reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-30 | Amendment HA 2 to SB 147 - Stricken in House | |
2019-06-30 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 147 - Stricken in House | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment HA 2 to SB 147 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-21 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 147 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-14 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2019-06-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-13 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 147 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate |