DE SB228 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-9)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-9)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act restores the Delaware Prescription Drug Payment Assistance Program (Program), which was eliminated in the Fiscal Year 2018 Annual Appropriations Act. This Act replaces Senate Bill 148 and makes the following additional changes:
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 16 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Restoration Of The Delaware Prescription Drug Payment Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-13 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2018-06-12 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-12 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-06-05 | Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate |