DE SB23 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act changes the employee classification of the Office of Highway Safety (OHS) director position from merit to exempt. The Department of Safety and Homeland Security (Department) is requesting the change to make the Departments director position employee classifications consistent. The Department is seeking the change while the OHS Director position is vacant.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Department Of Safety And Homeland Security.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Sen. Darius Brown [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] |
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. William Bush [D] | Rep. John Viola [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-22 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2019-03-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |