DE SB27 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act, named the Share the Care Act, permits an individual employed by a personal assistance services agency to administer medications to an adult individual who resides in the individuals own home if a responsible caregiver does the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Nursing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-02 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2019-04-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-18 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |