DE SB28 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act increases the penalties for parking in an area designated for a vehicle being used by an individual with a disability. For a first offense this Act increases the monetary penalty from $100 to $200. For a subsequent offense, this Act increases the monetary penalty from $200 to $300. The offenses subject to these increased penalties are included without change in lines 4 through 27 to add context.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Penalties For Unlawfully Parking In An Area Designated For Or Using The Privileges Of An Individual With A Disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-07 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-28 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2019-03-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-03-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate |