DE SB37 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

In our modern society, a criminal record can limit a persons opportunities and the quality of life they can achieve for themselves and their families for years, and even decades, after that person has completed the terms of the criminal sentence imposed. Even the existence of an arrest record with no conviction can limit job opportunities, housing, access to higher education, credit, and access to jobs that require professional licensing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 4, Title 10, Title 11, And Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating Expungement Of Records Of Adult Arrest And Conviction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30 Signed by Governor
2019-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT
2019-06-18 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2019-05-16 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2019-05-08 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 On Its Merits
2019-04-18 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2019-04-17 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-04-17 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-04-15 was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 37

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback