DE SB48 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires that bidders for public works contracts that are above a minimum value and required to provide the prevailing wage include approved craft training programs for journeyman and apprentice levels if the contract is not for a federal highway project. This Substitute Act differs from Senate Bill No. 48 as follows:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Public Works Contracting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 NO | |
2019-06-06 | Amendment SA 5 to SS 1 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 7 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING | |
2019-06-04 | Passed By House. Votes: 26 YES 15 NO | |
2019-06-04 | Amendment HA 2 to SS 1 - Defeated In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-04 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-04 | Amendment HA 2 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-04 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-27 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |
2019-03-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 8 NO | |
2019-03-26 | Amendment SA 4 to SS 1 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 8 YES 13 NO | |
2019-03-26 | Amendment SA 3 to SS 1 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 8 YES 13 NO | |
2019-03-26 | Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 8 YES 13 NO | |
2019-03-26 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 8 YES 13 NO | |
2019-03-26 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 48 |