DE SB5 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act addresses the serious problem of individuals dumping large quantities of trash on public and private property, by:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Litter Control Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-29 Signed by Governor
2019-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-03-27 Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2019-03-19 Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
2019-03-14 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2019-03-14 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2019-03-13 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-03-12 was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 5

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback