DE SB65 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Conversion therapy is a practice or treatment that seeks to change an individuals sexual orientation or gender identity, including any effort to change behaviors or gender expressions or to eliminate or reduce sexual or romantic attractions or feelings toward individuals of the same gender. Conversion therapy has been rejected by all mainstream medical and mental health organizations, and there is no credible evidence that it is effective. Moreover, this practice poses enormous health risks to LGBTQ youth, including an increased sense of shame, guilt, hopelessness, stress, and anger, thus increasing the risk of anxiety, depression, and self-harm. The harm done by conversion therapy can last well into adulthood.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 24 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Conversion Therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-07 | Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 14 NO 3 NOT VOTING | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 4 to SB 65 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 24 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 3 to SB 65 - Stricken in House | |
2018-03-01 | Amendment HA 3 to SB 65 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 5 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-18 | ReAssigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2017-05-17 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 3 NO 4 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2017-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-02 | ReAssigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2017-04-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |