DE SB8 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act eliminates the set bargaining unit classifications established in 19 Del. C. ยง 1311A(b) and allows exclusive representatives of bargaining units to work with the Secretary of the Department of Human Resources to organize or consolidate bargaining units in a manner in which they can agree for purposes of collective bargaining. It also eliminates the requirement that exclusive bargaining representatives of exclusive bargaining units form a coalition for collective bargaining. The Act eliminates the provision allowing for an employee organization to seek to be certified for unrepresented employees. The Act provides that parties may engage in collective bargaining for compensation in conjunction with or separately from collective bargaining for terms and conditions. It requires that the negotiation of collective bargaining agreements be staggered over time while providing that collective bargaining agreements currently in place remain in place until they expire by their own terms. While the Act allows for exclusive representatives to bargain for different pay rate increases, it prohibits the compensation of bargaining units from exceeding the pay ranges for each pay grade as established each year in the appropriations act. In addition, it retains the existing scope of bargaining contained in 19 Del.C. Section 1311A(a).
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code And Chapter 280, Volume 81 Of The Laws Of Delaware Relating To Collective Bargaining For State Employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-04-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 2 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-12 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-27 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |
2019-03-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-26 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 8 |