DE SB83 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adopts the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact (Compact). The Compact benefits the public by improving continuity of care, increasing license portability for military spouses, and increasing access to physical therapy providers. Under the Compact, physical therapists and physical therapist assistants licensed in a Compact member state may obtain an expedited license allowing licensees to practice in another Compact member state. In adopting the Compact, the state-based licensure system is preserved but communication between states is enhanced.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Physical Therapy Licensure Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-12 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2019-06-11 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-04 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-07 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |